Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 2 For 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Full Volume Music, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Fuel Publishing Inc., Counting Crows, LLC, Hip City Music Inc., Hifrost Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, BMG Rights Management US LLC and Scrap Metal Music
Defendant: Jolynn Romano, Larry Nelson, II, 2 For 1, LLC and Lawrence Pawlowski
Case Number: 4:2019cv00047
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice Defendant Lawrence Pawloski. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/23/19. (jrb)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Responses due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/22/19. (trb) Modified on 3/25/2019 (trb).
March 22, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Pawlowski as Party Defendant. (trb)
March 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Pawlowski as Party Defendant. (trb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Pawlowski as Party Defendant by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2019. (Covington, Troy)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to 04/05/2019 by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2019. (Covington, Troy)
March 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 3/22/2019 for Jolynn Romano, Larry Nelson, II, 2 For 1, LLC. Answer due 3/23/2019 for Lawrence Pawlowski. (trb)
March 6, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb).
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. 2 For 1, LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb).
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Lawrence Pawlowski served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/23/2019 (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb).
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Larry Nelson, II served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb).
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Jolynn Romano served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Covington, Troy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying TEGNA, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Covington, Troy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Covington, Troy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trb)
February 26, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2548319. (trb)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General ORDER of pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (trb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishign Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Schedule)(trb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 2 For 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Full Volume Music
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Da Crippler Publishing
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management GMBH
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soar Loser Music
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E W C Publishing Co.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuel Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Counting Crows, LLC
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hip City Music Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hifrost Publishing
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collipark Music
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management US LLC
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scrap Metal Music
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolynn Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Nelson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 For 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?