Watts v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Lamarlvin Watts
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00078
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss WATTSS 28 U.S.C. 2255 PETITION by United States Of America. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Davids, Justin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin G. Davids on behalf of United States Of America (Davids, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Amend/Correct as to Lamarlvin Watts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 05/22/2019. (evk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION of Supplemental #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Lamarlvin Watts. Responses due by 5/16/2019. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(evk)
April 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 7/16/2019. (evk) Modified on 4/19/2019 (evk).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Government to respond re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Lamarlvin Watts within ninety days from the date of this order. ( Compliance due by 7/16/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 04/17/2019. (evk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Lamarlvin Watts. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Envelope)(trb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamarlvin Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: Tania D. Groover
Represented By: James Christian Stuchell
Represented By: Justin G. Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?