Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company v. Stevens Hale & Associates

Plaintiff: Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company
Defendant: Stevens Hale & Associates
Case Number: 4:2019cv00079
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Lee, Pamela)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Encompass Online Form, #2 Exhibit B - Encompass Instructions, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Policy History)(Maine, Dana)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company. Stevens Hale & Associates waiver sent on 4/12/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Lee, Pamela)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dana K. Maine by Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(Lee, Pamela)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/11/19. (loh)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stevens Hale & Associates, filed by Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company. Receipt # 113J-2580458 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company v. Stevens Hale & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Encompass Home & Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela Newsom Lee
Represented By: Dana K. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Hale & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?