Carpenter et al v. Ternstrom et al
Plaintiff: Maria Ternstrom, Collette Carpenter and Jon Ternstrom
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00100
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. (wwp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants reply due by 7/19/2019. (wwp)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Plsintiff's Response due by 7/2/2019. (wwp)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/1/19. (wwp)
June 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. (wwp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Second (Uncontested) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dean, Kevin) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct text (en).
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (loh)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/13/19. (loh)
June 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings . (jrb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Re: #8 , by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dean, Kevin) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jrb).
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Lockheed Martin Corporation served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Dean, Kevin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Responses due by 6/18/2019. (Michel, Carol)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER reassigning case to the Honorable Dudley H. Bowen, Jr. for further plenary disposition. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/16/2019. (jlh)
May 16, 2019 Judge Judge Dudley H. Bowen added. Judge Judge William T. Moore, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (jlh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (wwp)
May 8, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number sav035317. (wwp)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Compliance due by 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Forms)(jrb)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/7/19. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb).
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted. (jrb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #2 Filing fee receipt) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #3 Correct cover sheet) (jrb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter et al v. Ternstrom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ternstrom
Represented By: Kevin R. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collette Carpenter
Represented By: Kevin R. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Ternstrom
Represented By: Kevin R. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Carol P. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?