Dream Finders Homes, LLC v. JM Allen Construction, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dream Finders Homes, LLC
Defendant: Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett, JM Allen Homes, LLC and JM Allen Construction, Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00140
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 28 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett. (Lovett, Robert) Modified on 7/29/2019 (evk).
July 26, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett. (Lovett, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett.(Lovett, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan C. Gaskin on behalf of JM Allen Homes, LLC (Gaskin, Johnathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan C. Gaskin on behalf of JM Allen Construction, Inc (Gaskin, Johnathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Service of Answer by Johnathan C. Gaskin on behalf of JM Allen Homes, LLC (Gaskin, Johnathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Service of Answer by Johnathan C. Gaskin on behalf of JM Allen Construction, Inc (Gaskin, Johnathan)
July 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brian Barrett answer due 7/29/2019; Susan Barrett answer due 7/29/2019. (wwp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's 6.1 Extension ORDER granting #20 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/15/19. (wwp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to July 29, 2019 by Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett. Responses due by 7/29/2019. (Lovett, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bates Lovett on behalf of Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett (Lovett, Robert)
July 13, 2019 Filing 18 Litigants' Bill of Rights by JM Allen Homes, LLC. (Gaskin, Johnathan) Modified on 7/31/2019 (evk).
July 13, 2019 Filing 17 Litigants' Bill of Rights by JM Allen Construction, Inc. (Gaskin, Johnathan) Modified on 7/31/2019 (evk).
July 13, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by JM Allen Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification)(Gaskin, Johnathan)
July 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by JM Allen Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification)(Gaskin, Johnathan)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brian Barrett answer due 7/17/2019; Susan Barrett answer due 7/17/2019; JM Allen Construction, Inc answer due 7/17/2019; JM Allen Homes, LLC answer due 7/17/2019. (wwp)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (Brian Barrett) Acknowledgement filed by Dream Finders Homes, LLC. (Bacon, Helen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (Susan Barrett) Acknowledgement filed by Dream Finders Homes, LLC. (Bacon, Helen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (JM Allen Construction, Inc.) Acknowledgement filed by Dream Finders Homes, LLC. (Bacon, Helen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed (JM Allen Homes, LLC) Acknowledgement filed by Dream Finders Homes, LLC. (Bacon, Helen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Dream Finders Homes, LLC. (Bacon, Helen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Dream Finders Homes, LLC AO121 (Bacon, Helen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 AO-121 MAIN) (wwp).
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett, JM Allen Construction, Inc, JM Allen Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 JM ALLEN CONSTRUCTIONS, #2 JM ALLEN HOMES, #3 SUSAN BARRETT)(wwp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Bacon, Helen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Bacon, Helen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Bacon, Helen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Bacon, Helen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Dream Finders Homes, LLC. (Bacon, Helen)
June 20, 2019 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
June 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2626415. (wwp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Barrett, Susan Barrett, JM Allen Construction, Inc, JM Allen Homes, LLC, filed by Dream Finders Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #2 Exhbit A-G) (wwp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dream Finders Homes, LLC v. JM Allen Construction, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Barrett
Represented By: Robert Bates Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Barrett
Represented By: Robert Bates Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Allen Homes, LLC
Represented By: Johnathan C. Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Allen Construction, Inc
Represented By: Johnathan C. Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dream Finders Homes, LLC
Represented By: Helen Bacon Bacon
Represented By: Helen Bacon Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?