Hunnings v. Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Bradley Hunnings
Defendant: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company and Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00151
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support, #20 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Roberts, Timothy) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jlh).
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. and Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Travelers Insurance Company. (Roberts, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery. (wwp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support, #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. and Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Travelers Insurance Company filed by Phillip Bradley Hunnings. (Pinckney, Kathryn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Phillip Bradley Hunnings re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #18 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery (Pinckney, Kathryn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery by Phillip Bradley Hunnings. Responses due by 8/30/2019. (Pinckney, Kathryn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. and Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Travelers Insurance Company filed by Phillip Bradley Hunnings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reservation of Rights Letter)(Pinckney, Kathryn)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support, #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. and Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Travelers Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/16/2019. (wwp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk Extension 6.1 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #13 MOTION to Dismiss, and #14 Motion to dismiss. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/31/19. (wwp)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support, #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. and Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Travelers Insurance Company by Phillip Bradley Hunnings. Responses due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pinckney, Kathryn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. and Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Travelers Insurance Company by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ann B. Mulcahy, #2 Exhibit St. Paul Mercury Policy)(Roberts, Timothy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/2/2019. (Roberts, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 07/11/19. (sff)
July 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. Judge Receipt Number 113J-2638461, Fee Amount $200,, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Dendinger Receipt Number 113J-2638470, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Dendinger Receipt Number 113J-2638470, Fee Amount $200, by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Roberts, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #3 Certificate of Good standing) (wwp).
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. Judge Receipt Number 113J-2638461, Fee Amount $200, by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Roberts, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (wwp).
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Hughes Pinckney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pinckney, Kathryn)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent J. Savage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Savage, Brent)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants answer due by 7/19/2019. (wwp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Extension 6.1 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time to file answer. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/1/19. (wwp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Timothy)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/5/2019. (pts)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/12/2019. (evk)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/8/2019. (evk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re #2 Notice of Removal. (evk)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 06/28/2019. (evk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV19-00923. (Filing fee paid on 06/28/2019 - $400.00; receipt number 113J-2632143)(Roberts, Timothy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(evk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.. (Roberts, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunnings v. Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Represented By: Timothy D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Represented By: Timothy D. Roberts
Represented By: Thomas J. Judge
Represented By: Matthew J. Dendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Bradley Hunnings
Represented By: Kathryn Hughes Pinckney
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?