Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Chisholm et al

Plaintiff: Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company
Defendant: Phillip Chisholm and Chester Jenkins
Case Number: 4:2019cv00158
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chester Jenkins. (evk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Coppage, Kenton)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. Phillip Chisholm waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/1/2019. (Coppage, Kenton)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (jrb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Chisholm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenton J. Coppage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?