Hernandez v. United States of America
Petitioner: Joaquin Mendez Hernandez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00204
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher L Ray
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 OBJECTION to #2 Report and Recommendations by Joaquin Mendez Hernandez. (jrb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge Recommending the dismissal of re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Joaquin Mendez Hernandez. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/29/19. (jrb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Joaquin Mendez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy Colleen Greenwood
Represented By: E. Gregory Gilluly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joaquin Mendez Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?