Hurt v. Eggers
Plaintiff: Rosa Hurt
Defendant: Laura Yvonne Eggers and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00205
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rosa Hurt (Major, George)
September 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Answer due 10/9/2019. (loh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER granting re #6 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1)to 10/09/2019 to File Answer. (loh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to 10/09/2019 Answer by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Massee, Kristin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Rosa Hurt (Major, George)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by George T. Major, Jr on behalf of Rosa Hurt (Major, George)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Laura Yvonne Eggers and USAA. (evk)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 08/22/2019. (evk)
August 22, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2670340. (evk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laura Yvonne Eggers, filed by Rosa Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(evk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurt v. Eggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Yvonne Eggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin Anne Massee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Hurt
Represented By: Eric Roden
Represented By: William J. Hunter
Represented By: George T. Major, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?