ROBERTS v. BRENNAN et al
Plaintiff: Ernest S. Roberts, Jr.
Defendant: MEGAN BRENNAN and ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00207
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.; adopting #7 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/4/19. (wwp)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge Recommending the denying of re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ernest S. Roberts, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/29/19. (jrb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of transfer of #1 Complaint to the Southern District of Georgia (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Notice Main) (wwp).
August 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (wwp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case transfer in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02160. Case transferred electronically
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/8/2019. (zjd) Modified on 8/9/2019 (zjd).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Georgia. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/30/2019. (zmc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERNEST S. ROBERTS, JR (zsb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEXANDER ACOSTA, MEGAN BRENNAN with Jury Demand filed by ERNEST S. ROBERTS, JR.(zsb)
July 15, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/15/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTS v. BRENNAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest S. Roberts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?