Savage v. International Longshore Association et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Savage
Defendant: Barry Griffen, Willie Seymore, Tim Mackey, International Longshore Association and Paul Mackey
Case Number: 4:2019cv00224
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due by 11/11/2019. (loh)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING re #5 Report and Recommendations; Denying re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to pay the filing fee or risk dismissal. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/28/19. (loh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge recommending the denying of re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andrea Savage. Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/13/19. (jrb)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/11/19. (jrb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (jrb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrea Savage. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrea Savage.(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage v. International Longshore Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Seymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?