Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00231
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim of TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd. by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Smith, Chandler)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tyler Bryant Walker. (Walker, Tyler)
October 18, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd. for dates of : 10/21/19 - 11/01/19. (wwp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd. for dates of : 10/21/19 - 11/01/19 by TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.. Responses due by 11/1/2019. (Walker, Tyler)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties by TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd. (Walker, Tyler)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Litigants' Bill of Rights by TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.. (Walker, Tyler)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Marine GL Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Marine GL Renewal, #3 Exhibit C - Bumbershoot Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Bumbershoot Renewal)(Walker, Tyler)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Chandler Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/8/19. (wwp)
October 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chandler L. Smith Receipt Number 113J-2700552, Fee Amount $200, (jgb)
October 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chandler L. Smith Receipt Number 113J-2700552, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chandler L. Smith Receipt Number 113J-2700552, Fee Amount $200, by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Responses due by 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McMickle, Scott) Modified on 10/8/2019 (jrb).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd. answer due 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/7/19. (loh)
October 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (wwp)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.. Responses due by 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Tyler)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (McMickle, Scott)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (McMickle, Scott)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd. (evk)
September 13, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2682755. (evk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 09/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (evk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd., filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(evk) Modified on 9/13/2019 (evk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Scott W. McMickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?