Sulfco, LLC v. SubGallagher Investment Trust et al
Plaintiff: Sulfco, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-50, Patricia Moore and SubGallagher Investment Trust
Case Number: 4:2019cv00255
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Sulfco, LLC. (Beldt, Bret)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Patricia Moore, SubGallagher Investment Trust. Responses due by 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit)(O'Day, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Patricia Moore and SubGallagher Investment Trust. (evk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Sulfco, LLC. Responses due by 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Bret Beldt)(Beldt, Bret)
October 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Patricia Moore answer due 11/1/2019; SubGallagher Investment Trust answer due 11/1/2019. (jrb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Rule 26 Order and Disclosure Statement served on SubGallagher Investment Trust (Patricia Moore) on 10/11/2019, filed by Sulfco, LLC. (Beldt, Bret)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Rule 26 Order and Disclosure Statement served on Patricia Moore on 10/11/2019, filed by Sulfco, LLC. (Beldt, Bret)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Sulfco, LLC. (Beldt, Bret)
October 7, 2019 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Patricia Moore and SubGallagher Investment Trust. (evk)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/07/2019. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (evk) Modified on 10/7/2019 (evk).
October 4, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2699195. (evk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sulfco, LLC against John Does 1-50, Patricia Moore, SubGallagher Investment Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Purchase & Installation Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Irrevocable Trust Receipt Surety Performance Guarantee, #4 Exhibit C - Claim of Materialman's or Mechanic's Lien, #5 Exhibit D - April 2019 Letter, #6 Exhibit E - July 2019 Letter)(evk) Modified on 10/7/2019 (evk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sulfco, LLC v. SubGallagher Investment Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SubGallagher Investment Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sulfco, LLC
Represented By: Bret A. Beldt
Represented By: Edwin W. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?