The Ford Plantation Club, Inc. v. New York Marine and General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.
Defendant: New York Marine and General Insurance Company and Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00261
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.. (Harris, Ashley)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2020. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Motions due by 4/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/27/19. (jrb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Holder Release, #2 Exhibit Oct 19, 2018 correspondence)(Miller, Edward)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Dismiss by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company, New York Marine and General Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/27/2019. (Maple, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by The Ford Plantation Club, Inc. re #11 Stipulation of Dismissal Withdrawal of Stipulation (Harris, Ashley)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.. (Harris, Ashley)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Corretti Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/24/2019. (evk)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ashley Noelle Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/24/2019. (evk)
October 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ashley Noelle Harris Receipt Number 113J-2708974, Fee Amount $200,, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2708950, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ashley Noelle Harris Receipt Number 113J-2708974, Fee Amount $200, by The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.. Responses due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clark, Margaret)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2708950, Fee Amount $200, by The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.. Responses due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clark, Margaret)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Edward) Modified on 10/16/2019 (wwp).
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Release))(Maple, Christy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company.(Maple, Christy)
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company answer due 10/17/2019; New York Marine and General Insurance Company answer due 10/17/2019. (jrb)
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: State Pending Motions due by 10/24/2019. (jrb)
October 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/ Pro Hac Vice due by 10/20/2019. Notice of Compliance due by 10/20/2019. (loh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
October 10, 2019 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/10/19. (loh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company from Superior Court of Bryan County, case number SUV2019000348. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2702961), filed by The Ford Plantation Club, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-All Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Demand, #3 Exhibit C-Notice to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ford Plantation Club, Inc. v. New York Marine and General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Marine and General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael H. Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?