Poser v. SunTrust Bank
Plaintiff: Lauren Poser
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 4:2019cv00270
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Lauren Poser. (Smith, Ian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by SunTrust Bank. (Washington, Destiny)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by SunTrust Bank.(Washington, Destiny)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER granting re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SunTrust Bank answer due 12/13/2019. (loh)
November 25, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (loh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SunTrust Bank. Responses due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Washington, Destiny)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Poser. SunTrust Bank served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Smith, Ian)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SunTrust Bank. (evk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/21/2019. (evk) Modified on 10/22/2019 (jlh).
October 18, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2708375. (evk) Modified on 10/21/2019 (evk).
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lauren Poser against SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(evk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poser v. SunTrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Poser
Represented By: Ian Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Destiny Smith Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?