Smith v. United States of America
Petitioner: Marion Smith
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00306
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/26/2019. (evk)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion in this case. Accordingly, Movant's unauthorized successive 2255 motion is DISMISSED. As a result, Movant's subsequent #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DISMISSED AS MOOT. In addition, Plaintiff is not entitled to a Certificate of Appealability, rendering moot any request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/23/2019. (evk)
December 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (evk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marion Smith. Responses due by 12/11/2019. (evk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Marion Smith. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/15/19. (loh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Marion Smith.(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy Colleen Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marion Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?