Martin v. Saul
Plaintiff: Anthony David Martin
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Classified By Court: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00340
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Paul McChesney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/16/20. (wwp) Modified on 1/17/2020 (jrb).
January 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2761255, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2761255, Fee Amount $200, by Anthony David Martin. Responses due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 List of attached cases, #2 Certficate of Good Standing)(McChesney, Paul)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony David Martin re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certified Mail Receipts)(Snyder, Charles)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Andrew Saul (Statkus, Shannon)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted. (evk)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order for Social Security Appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/18/2019. (evk) Modified on 12/20/2019 (evk).
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony David Martin. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(evk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony David Martin against Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(evk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony David Martin
Represented By: Charles W. Snyder
Represented By: Paul T. McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?