J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC et al v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Plaintiff: Braemer Road, LLC and J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00345
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court issues the following deadlines for the Phase One discovery. Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020. Phase One Discovery due by 5/11/2020. Motions due by 6/8/2020. Initial Expert Witness Reports and Disclosures due by 3/10/2020. Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports and Disclosures due by 4/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 02/11/2020. (MG)
February 5, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., filed by J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC, Braemer Road, LLC. (MG)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Restated Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 02/05/2020. (MG)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Eric Bilik. Jennifer R. Burbine has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 4, 2020. (edd)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 02/03/2020. (JH)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Order to the assigned District Judge for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/29/2020. (loh)
January 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Restated Complaint, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2770085, Fee Amount $200. (jrb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2770085, Fee Amount $200, by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. Responses due by 2/10/2020. (Dover, R.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #1 Correct Image) (jrb).
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Restated Complaint by Braemer Road, LLC, J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Owen)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dover, R.)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Porterfield. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/23/2020. (evk) Modified on 1/27/2020 (wwp).
January 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for (Christopher Porterfield). Receipt Number 113J-2764642, Fee Amount $200. (loh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for (Christopher Porterfield). Receipt Number 113J-2764642, Fee Amount $200, by Braemer Road, LLC, J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC. Responses due by 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Admission)(Murphy, Owen)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney R. Patrick Dover. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/09/2020. (evk)
January 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (R. Patrick Dover) Receipt Number 113J-2756785, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (R. Patrick Dover) Receipt Number 113J-2756785, Fee Amount $200, by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. Responses due by 1/22/2020. (Burbine, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #1 Main Doc) (wwp).
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Braemer Road, LLC, J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC. (Murphy, Owen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Burbine, Jennifer)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. re #5 Notice (Other), Set/Reset Deadlines (Notice Regarding Motions Pending in State Court) (Burbine, Jennifer)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to all counsel of record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/2/2020. (wwp)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (wwp)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. from Superior Court of Chatham County, Georgia, case number SPCV19-00701-KA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2748617), filed by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit 2 Plaintiffs' Combined Responses to CSXT's First Interogartories, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs' Responses to CSXT's First Request for Admissions, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs' Responses to CSXT's First Requests for Production, #6 Exhibit 5 Declaration of David Hoffman)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC et al v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braemer Road, LLC
Represented By: Owen C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. Goldstein Investments, LLC
Represented By: Owen C. Murphy
Represented By: Christopher M. Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: R. Patrick Dover
Represented By: Jennifer R. Burbine
Represented By: R. Eric Bilik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?