Daniel Defense, Inc. v. ARC Group Worldwide, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Defense, Inc.
Defendant: ARC Colorado, Inc. and ARC Group Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00355
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Daniel Defense, Inc.s Verified Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/14/20. (jrb)
February 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ARC Colorado, Inc. answer due 3/6/2020; ARC Group Worldwide, Inc. answer due 3/6/2020. (jrb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleadings in Response to Verified Complaint , by Daniel Defense, Inc.. Responses due by 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casella, Anthony)
February 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleadings in Response to Verified Complaint. (jrb)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Pleadings in Response to Verified Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/31/2020. (loh)
January 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ARC Colorado, Inc. answer due 2/14/2020; ARC Group Worldwide, Inc. answer due 2/14/2020. (loh)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleadings in Response to Verified Complaint , by Daniel Defense, Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2020. (Casella, Anthony)
January 30, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleadings in Response to Verified Complaint. (jrb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK Extension 6.1 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. ARC Colorado, Inc. answer due 1/31/2020; ARC Group Worldwide, Inc. answer due 1/31/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/24/20. (wwp)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Daniel Defense, Inc.. Responses due by 2/6/2020. (Casella, Anthony)
January 23, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (jrb)
January 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ARC Colorado, Inc. answer due 1/28/2020. (jrb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and related docs served on ARC Colorado, Inc. on 01/08/2020, filed by Daniel Defense, Inc.. (Casella, Anthony)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Defense, Inc.. ARC Group Worldwide, Inc. served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Casella, Anthony)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (evk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Daniel Defense, Inc. (evk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Daniel Defense, Inc. (evk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/31/2019. (evk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Defense, Inc against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(evk)
December 31, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2751677 (evk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Defense, Inc. v. ARC Group Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC Colorado, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC Group Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Defense, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Robert Casella
Represented By: William G. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?