Mortimer Family Funeral Home, LLC et al v. Johnson Consulting Group et al
Plaintiff: John Arthur Mortimer, II, Mortimer Funeral Home, Inc., Robert Bowles Mortimer, Jr. and Mortimer Family Funeral Home, LLC
Defendant: Opulence Protection, Radar Lender Services, LLC, Johnson Consulting Group, First Chatham Bank and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2020cv00072
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE to all counsel of record that a case was transferred to the Southern District of Georgia re #1 Notice of Removal. (wwp)
April 13, 2020 Filing 32 Case transfer in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00180. Case transferred electronically
April 9, 2020 Case Transferred to Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/9/20. (bnd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 30 Response to #28 Order for Additional Briefing. (Northington, Hiawatha)
March 27, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Opulence Protection. (Northington, Hiawatha)
March 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Change Venue . Responses due by 3/27/2020 (jla)
March 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opulence Protection answer due 3/27/2020. (jla)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/20. (bnd)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/20. (bnd)
February 28, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Opulence Protection. (Northington, Hiawatha)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/12/2020. (rtc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 9/29/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/13/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/13/2020. Motions due by 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/11/2020. (rtc)
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by First Chatham Bank, John Arthur Mortimer, II, Robert Bowles Mortimer, Jr, Mortimer Family Funeral Home, LLC, Mortimer Funeral Home, Inc., Opulence Protection, Radar Lender Services, LLC. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jwr)
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 2/11/2020. (rtc)
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Johnson Consulting Group d/b/a JCG Capital, LLC with Prejudice. (Donahoo, Price)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Opulence Protection answer due 2/28/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/16/20. (bnd)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by Opulence Protection. (Northington, Hiawatha)
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Change Venue filed by First Chatham Bank, Radar Lender Services, LLC. (Dollarhide, John)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hiawatha Northington, II on behalf of Opulence Protection (Northington, Hiawatha)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Todd M. Baiad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/6/20. (bnd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 2/11/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion re #7 MOTION to Change Venue . (Campbell, Jason) Modified on 1/8/2020 (jla).
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Change Venue filed by John Arthur Mortimer, II, Robert Bowles Mortimer, Jr, Mortimer Family Funeral Home, LLC, Mortimer Funeral Home, Inc.. (Campbell, Jason)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Todd Baiad,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1754245) by First Chatham Bank, Radar Lender Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Georgia Bar Cert. of Good Standing for Todd Baiad) (Dollarhide, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by First Chatham Bank, Radar Lender Services, LLC. (Dollarhide, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Change Venue filed by First Chatham Bank, Radar Lender Services, LLC. (Dollarhide, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue by First Chatham Bank, Radar Lender Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Loan Agreement) (Dollarhide, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson Consulting Group. (Donahoo, Price)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Price W. Donahoo on behalf of Johnson Consulting Group (Donahoo, Price)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/16/19. (rtc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons Issued to Johnson Consulting Group, #2 Exhibit B - Summons Issued to First Chatham Bank, #3 Exhibit C - Summons Issued to Radar Lending Services, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Summons Issued to Opulence Protection, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' Complaint) (Dollarhide, John)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mortimer Family Funeral Home, LLC, John Arthur Mortimer, II, Robert Bowles Mortimer, Jr, Mortimer Funeral Home, Inc.. (jla)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Chatham Bank, Radar Lender Services, LLC from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0104CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1749839) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by First Chatham Bank, Radar Lender Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortimer Family Funeral Home, LLC et al v. Johnson Consulting Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opulence Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radar Lender Services, LLC
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Consulting Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Chatham Bank
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Arthur Mortimer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortimer Funeral Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bowles Mortimer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortimer Family Funeral Home, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?