Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Housing Authority of Savannah et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Housing Authority of Savannah, Carnesville Farm and Home Supply, Inc and Carnesville Farm and Home Supply, Inc doing business as Peach State General Contractors
Case Number: 4:2020cv00115
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Carnesville Farm and Home Supply, Inc answer due 7/23/2020. (csr)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Carnesville Farm & Home Supply on 07/02/2020, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Smith, John)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/21/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carnesville Farm and Home Supply, Inc, Housing Authority of Savannah. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(wwp)
May 21, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number Agasdc-284854. (wwp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnesville Farm and Home Supply, Inc, Housing Authority of Savannah, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Housing Authority of Savannah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of Savannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnesville Farm and Home Supply, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnesville Farm and Home Supply, Inc doing business as Peach State General Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared Matthew Koebble
Represented By: John Holder Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?