Campbell v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Maronica Shuron Campbell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00132
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Maronica Shuron Campbell. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/20/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Olinsky, Howard) Modified on 7/30/2020 (loh).
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Leithart, Otto)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney, United States Attorney General, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region I. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(loh)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/16/2020. (loh)
June 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance to refile Motion for IFP due by 6/25/2020. (wwp)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (wwp) Modified on 6/11/2020 (wwp).
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(wwp)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Maronica Shuron Campbell. (wwp)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Maronica Shuron Campbell. (wwp)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maronica Shuron Campbell. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(wwp)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Maronica Shuron Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maronica Shuron Campbell
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?