Central States Trucking Co. v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Central States Trucking Co.
Defendant: Tiger Trans LLC, Amber Small and Andrea Morgan
Case Number: 4:2020cv00145
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #29 MOTION for Interlocutory Order filed by Andrea Morgan, Central States Trucking Co., Tiger Trans LLC, Amber Small. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 8/8/20. (jgb)
August 8, 2020 Hearing on Motion for Interlocutory Injunction scheduled for 8/10/2020 02:30 PM in Savannah - 3rd Floor before Judge William T. Moore, Jr. is CANCELLED. (jgb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 29 CONSENT MOTION for Interlocutory Order by Central States Trucking Co., Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (jgb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central States Trucking Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Mahan, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Trey Simmons)(Washington, Destiny) Modified on 8/10/2020 (jlh).
August 3, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central States Trucking Co. filed by Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (Barrow, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Protective Order, subject to the modifications herein. Protective Order attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/30/2020. (pts)
July 30, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 Consent MOTION for Protective Order. (csr)
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Central States Trucking Co.. Responses due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Casella, Anthony)
July 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Interlocutory Injunction is scheduled for 8/10/2020 02:30 PM in Savannah - 3rd Floor before Judge William T. Moore, Jr. (jgb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Robert Casella on behalf of Central States Trucking Co. (Casella, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Tiger Trans LLC. (Barrow, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Amber Small. (Barrow, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Andrea Morgan. (Barrow, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (Barrow, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC.(Barrow, Joseph)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting re #13 Motion for Leave of Absence for July 13, 2020 to July 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/16/2020. (loh)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/10/2020. (loh)
July 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Central States Trucking Co. for dates of July 13, 2020 to July 17, 2020 on behalf of Jeffrey D. Mokotoff. (JH)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Central States Trucking Co. for dates of : on behalf of Jeffrey D. Mokotoff for July 13, 2020 to July 17, 2020 by Central States Trucking Co.. Responses due by 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Washington, Destiny)
July 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt Number AGASDC-2878595, Fee Amount $200. (loh)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2878595, Fee Amount $200, by Central States Trucking Co.. Responses due by 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 List of Prior Pro Hac Vice Cases, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Washington, Destiny)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States Trucking Co. Amber Small served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Washington, Destiny)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States Trucking Co. Andrea Morgan served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Washington, Destiny) Modified on 7/8/2020 (loh).
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Tiger Trans LLC answer due 7/21/2020. (jrb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Patricia Santos on behalf of Tiger Trans, LLC on June 30, 2020, filed by Central States Trucking Co.. (Washington, Destiny)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Central States Trucking Co.. Responses due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Washington, Destiny)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central States Trucking Co. identifying Forward Air Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Washington, Destiny)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Central States Trucking Co.. (Washington, Destiny)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (jrb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Central States Trucking Co. Filing Fee $400.00, AGASDC-2870803. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Tom Powers)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States Trucking Co. v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States Trucking Co.
Represented By: Destiny Smith Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Mokotoff
Represented By: Anthony Robert Casella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Trans LLC
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Small
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Morgan
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?