Hobbs v. Salem Holding Company et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Hobbs
Defendant: Salem Holding Company and Salem Leasing Corporation doing business as Salem National Lease
Case Number: 4:2020cv00151
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement Status by Salem Holding Company, Salem Leasing Corporation re 9 Notice of Hearing. (Keenan, Sean)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/17/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Parties will be contacted by email with dial in instructions. (MD)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2020. Discovery due by 10/7/2020. Motions due by 3/16/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 11/16/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 12/16/2020. Status Report due by 3/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/11/2020. (loh)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler M. Love on behalf of Thomas Hobbs (Love, Tyler)
August 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (wwp)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keenan, Sean)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Salem Holding Company, Salem Leasing Corporation. (Keenan, Sean)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Salem Holding Company, Salem Leasing Corporation.(Keenan, Sean)
July 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: State Motions due by 7/23/2020. (wwp)
July 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Motion/Notice of Appearance due by 7/19/2020. Compliance due by 7/19/2020. (loh)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/9/2020. (loh)
July 9, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Salem Holding Company, Salem Leasing Corporation from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV20-00884. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2877089). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, Summons, and Answer, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to the United States District Court)(loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (loh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Salem Holding Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hobbs
Represented By: Allison J. Marani
Represented By: Tyler M. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Holding Company
Represented By: Sean Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Leasing Corporation doing business as Salem National Lease
Represented By: Sean Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?