Washington v. Wynn et al
Plaintiff: Rakem Washington
Defendant: Proficient Auto, Inc. and Jerry Wynn
Case Number: 4:2020cv00155
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/2/2020. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/2/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/4/2021. Motions due by 3/10/2021. Status Report due by 2/25/2021. (loh)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #11 Motion Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/20/2020. (loh)
August 19, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #11 MOTION Amended Scheduling Order. (jlh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION Amended Scheduling Order by Proficient Auto, Inc.. Responses due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order)(Eason, Donavan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Jerry Wynn.(Eason, Donavan)
August 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Jerry Wynn answer due 8/20/2020. (pts)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Jerry Wynn on July 30, 2020, filed by Rakem Washington. (Diamond, Seth)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2020. Discovery due by 8/20/2020. Motions due by 1/7/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 10/21/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 11/20/2020. Status Report due by 12/21/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/3/20. (wwp)
July 30, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rowlen, Brantley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth M. Diamond on behalf of Rakem Washington (Diamond, Seth)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Proficient Auto, Inc..(Eason, Donavan)
July 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proficient Auto, Inc. answer due 7/21/2020. Motions due by 7/28/2020. (loh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Proficient Auto, Inc.. (Eason, Donavan)
July 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proficient Auto, Inc. answer due 7/28/2020. (loh)
July 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/Pro Hac Vice Motion due by 7/24/2020. Compliance due by 7/24/2020. (loh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #1 Corrected Notice) (loh).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/14/2020. (loh)
July 14, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Proficient Auto, Inc. from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV20-00790. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2880716). (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, Summons, Interrogatoties, Request for Production of Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2020: #3 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (slt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Wynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proficient Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Brantley Cole Rowlen
Represented By: Donavan K. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Wynn
Represented By: Brantley Cole Rowlen
Represented By: Donavan K. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakem Washington
Represented By: Seth M. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?