Sauer Incorporated v. McLendon Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sauer Incorporated
Defendant: McClendon Enterprises, Inc. and Magruder Construction Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: McLendon Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00157
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Alternative Dispute Resolution by Sauer Incorporated (Wahl, Hans)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by McLendon Enterprises, Inc. (Phillips, Christopher)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Sauer Incorporated. (Wahl, Hans)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James O. Birr, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 08/24/2020. (JH)
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2908974, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2908974, Fee Amount $200, by Sauer Incorporated. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Wahl, Hans)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Magruder Construction Company. (wwp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (Phillips, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Main doc) (wwp).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Magruder Construction Company, filed by McLendon Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Phillips, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by McLendon Enterprises, Inc..(Phillips, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by McLendon Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by McLendon Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Christopher)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sauer Incorporated. All Defendants. Answer due 8/18/20. (Wahl, Hans) Modified on 8/6/2020 (wwp).
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McLendon Enterprises, Inc. (loh)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/16/2020. (loh) Modified on 7/16/2020 (wwp).
July 16, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McLendon Enterprises, Inc., filed by Sauer Incorporated. Rec't AGASDC-2882412. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauer Incorporated v. McLendon Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClendon Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magruder Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sauer Incorporated
Represented By: Hans C. Wahl
Represented By: James O. Birr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: McLendon Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?