Williams & Haupt, P.C. v. Century Bank et al
Plaintiff: Williams & Haupt, P.C.
Defendant: Optus Bank, Farmers & Merchants Bank of South Carolina, South Atlantic Bank, Century Bank and Trust Company, Truist Bank, United Community Bank (Georgia), Synovus Bank, Truist Financial Corp., Colony Bankcorp, Inc., United Community Bank, Inc., First Chatham Bank, Colony Bank, Century Bank and Century Bank of Georgia
Case Number: 4:2020cv00160
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Optus Bank answer due 10/6/2020. (wwp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Optus Bank on 09/15/2020, filed by Williams & Haupt, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Lynch, Travis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Century Bank of Georgia. (wwp)
September 14, 2020 Filing 51 Summons Submitted (Lynch, Travis)
September 14, 2020 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against Farmers & Merchants Bank of South Carolina, First Chatham Bank, Optus Bank, South Atlantic Bank, United Community Bank (Georgia), United Community Bank, Inc., Century Bank of Georgia, filed by Williams & Haupt, P.C..(Lynch, Travis)
September 11, 2020 Filing 49 ******* MOTION for Hearing TO CONSOLIDATE FUTURE MOTION PRACTICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS SCHEDULE by Williams & Haupt, P.C.. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, Travis)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caren D. Enloe; and granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth A. Blackwell. Alan D. Leeth has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/10/2020. (cjc)
September 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. Blackwell Receipt Number AGASDC-2920369, Fee Amount $200. (pts)
September 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caren D. Enloe Receipt Number AGASDC-2920346, Fee Amount $200. (ca)
September 9, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. Blackwell Receipt Number AGASDC-2920369, Fee Amount $200, by Farmers & Merchants Bank of South Carolina. Responses due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leeth, Alan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caren D. Enloe Receipt Number AGASDC-2920346, Fee Amount $200, by Farmers & Merchants Bank of South Carolina. Responses due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leeth, Alan)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING re #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Defendants Century Bank and Century Bank and Trust Company. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/9/2020. (ca) Modified on 9/9/2020 (JH).
August 31, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by First Chatham Bank. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Baiad, Todd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Williams & Haupt, P.C. (Lynch, Travis)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United Community Bank (Georgia) answer due 9/25/2020; United Community Bank, Inc. answer due 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/26/2020. (pts)
August 26, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Williams & Haupt, P.C. (Lynch, Travis)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric R. Hail; and granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Clyde. Rachel E. Hudgins has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/25/2020. (cjc)
August 25, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed). (wwp)
August 25, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric R. Hail Fee Amount $200, #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Clyde Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
August 25, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Deficiency re #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Clyde. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/27/2020. (pts)
August 25, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Deficiency re #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric R. Hail. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/27/2020. (pts)
August 25, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by United Community Bank (Georgia), United Community Bank, Inc.. Responses due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Taube, Gregory)
August 24, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Clyde Fee Amount $200, by South Atlantic Bank. Responses due by 9/7/2020. (Hudgins, Rachel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Receipt) (csr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #2 List of cases) (wwp).
August 24, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric R. Hail Fee Amount $200, by South Atlantic Bank. Responses due by 9/7/2020. (Hudgins, Rachel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Receipt) (csr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #2 List of cases) (wwp).
August 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Colony Bank answer due 9/24/2020; Colony Bankcorp, Inc. answer due 9/24/2020. (pts)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Colony Bank and Colony Bankcorp, Inc. answer due 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/24/2020. (pts)
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed). (wwp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed), by Colony Bank, Colony Bankcorp, Inc.. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 A (Proposed Order))(Wallace, Kyle)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Farmers & Merchants Bank of South Carolina answer due 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/20/2020. (thb)
August 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed). (wwp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Farmers & Merchants Bank of South Carolina. Responses due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Leeth, Alan)
August 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: South Atlantic Bank answer due 9/24/2020. (pts)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have through and including 9/24/2020, in which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/19/2020. (pts)
August 19, 2020 PRO HAC VICE PAID for Eric Jon Taylor in the Amount of $200.00. Receipt # AUG028130; Date: 08/19/2020. (jlh)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Jon Taylor. Rachel E Hudgins has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/19/2020. (cjc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Nathanson; and granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonio M. Haynes. Kimberly Cofer Butler has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/19/2020. (cjc)
August 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric John Taylor Fee Amount $200. (pts)
August 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Antonio M. Haynes Receipt Number AGASDC-2905880, Fee Amount $200,, #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Nathanson Receipt Number AGASDC-2905864, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nitoj P. Singh. Travis E. Lynch has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/18/2020. (cjc)
August 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading re: Complaint. (pts)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James F. McDonough, III; and granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harmeet K. Dhillon. Travis E. Lynch has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Courts Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/18/2020. (cjc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric John Taylor Fee Amount $200, by South Atlantic Bank. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Hudgins, Rachel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2020: #1 List of cases) (wwp).
August 18, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Antonio M. Haynes Receipt Number AGASDC-2905880, Fee Amount $200, by Synovus Bank. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Cases, #2 Supplement Good Standing Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order (proposed))(Butler, Kimberly)
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Nathanson Receipt Number AGASDC-2905864, Fee Amount $200, by Synovus Bank. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Cases, #2 Supplement Good Standing Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order (proposed))(Butler, Kimberly)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Williams & Haupt, P.C.. (Lynch, Travis)
August 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance for pro hac application due by 9/1/2020. (wwp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing deficiency re #18 Notice of Filing. (wwp)
August 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2905178, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2905178, Fee Amount $200, by Williams & Haupt, P.C.. Responses due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing For Nitoj P. Singh)(Lynch, Travis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #2 Certificate of Good Standing Main Doc) (wwp).
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading re: Complaint, by South Atlantic Bank. Responses due by 8/31/2020. (Hudgins, Rachel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing by Synovus Bank re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order Dismissing Amended Complaint - N.Dist of FL)(Butler, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Synovus Bank. (Butler, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2904286, Fee Amount $200,, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2904293, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
August 17, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. (JH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Drayton Bradley on behalf of First Chatham Bank (Bradley, Lucas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Baiad on behalf of First Chatham Bank (Baiad, Todd)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray recused. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward a copy of this order to the assigned District Judge for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 08/14/2020. (JH)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2904293, Fee Amount $200, by Williams & Haupt, P.C.. Responses due by 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing For Harmeet K. Dhillon)(Lynch, Travis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #2 List of cases) (wwp).
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2904286, Fee Amount $200, by Williams & Haupt, P.C.. Responses due by 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing for James F. McDonough, III)(Lynch, Travis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #2 List of cases) (wwp).
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Synovus Bank. (Butler, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Synovus Bank. Responses due by 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to MTD, #2 Exhibit Ex B to MTD)(Butler, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Cofer Butler on behalf of Synovus Bank (Butler, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Threlkeld on behalf of Synovus Bank (Threlkeld, Paul)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle G.A. Wallace on behalf of Colony Bank, Colony Bankcorp, Inc. (Wallace, Kyle)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Refiled or Related Cases by Travis E. Lynch on behalf of Williams & Haupt, P.C. (Lynch, Travis)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Williams & Haupt, P.C. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (Lynch, Travis)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JH)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 07/21/2020. (JH)
July 21, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (JH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Submitted. (JH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Williams & Haupt, P.C. Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-2885850, $400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JH) Modified on 7/21/2020 (JH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams & Haupt, P.C. v. Century Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optus Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers & Merchants Bank of South Carolina
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Blackwell
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Represented By: Alan D. Leeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Atlantic Bank
Represented By: Jennifer Clyde
Represented By: Eric R. Hail
Represented By: Eric Jon Taylor
Represented By: Rachel Erin Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Community Bank (Georgia)
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Antonio M. Haynes
Represented By: Kimberly Cofer Butler
Represented By: Paul J. Nathanson
Represented By: Paul H. Threlkeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Bankcorp, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle G.A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Community Bank, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Chatham Bank
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Bank
Represented By: Kyle G.A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Bank of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams & Haupt, P.C.
Represented By: Travis E. Lynch
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: James F. McDonough, III
Represented By: Nitoj P. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?