v. Crowell et al
Plaintiff: Jami Len Crowell
Defendant: Foster and Monroe (LLC), Jane Doe #1, Jane and/or John Does #3, #4, #5, #6, Coastal Recovery Group LLC and John Doe #2
Case Number: 4:2020cv00163
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Foster and Monroe (LLC). (loh)
August 31, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 First MOTION to authorize alternative service upon New York Secretary of State. (loh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A re #13 First MOTION to authorize alternative service upon New York Secretary of State. (loh)
August 29, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION to authorize alternative service upon New York Secretary of State by Jami Len Crowell. Responses due by 9/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - email exchange w NY Dept of State, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Authorize Alternative Service on NY Sec of State, #3 summons in blank)(Addleton, David)
August 29, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jami Len Crowell as to Coastal Recovery Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Coffman nonservice, #2 Exhibit Ex B Wlodarski nonservice, #3 Exhibit Ex C Frederick w telephone notes)(Addleton, David)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Foster and Monroe (LLC) by Jami Len Crowell. Responses due by 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Clerk's entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Addleton, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Coastal Recovery Group LLC. (JH)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jami Len Crowell as to Coastal Recovery Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-NY SoS rejects service, #2 Exhibit B-3770 Transit Road appears shuttered, #3 Exhibit C-Google Street View reveals for sale sign)(Addleton, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 CRG Summons c/o Coffman, #2 CRG Summons c/o Frederick, #3 CRG Summons c/o Wldarski)(Addleton, David)
August 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Foster and Monroe (LLC) answer due 8/17/2020. (loh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, etc., by T. W. Fuller showing he served on Foster and Monroe (LLC) c/o its Registered Agent Legalinc, on July 27, 2020, filed by Jami Len Crowell. (Addleton, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Coastal Recovery Group LLC. (wwp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Addleton, David)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/23/20. (wwp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coastal Recovery Group LLC, Foster and Monroe (LLC). (Attachments: #1 Summons2, #2 Summons3)(wwp)
July 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC 288278. (wwp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jami Len Crowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Organization Articles, #2 Exhibit B Foster and Monroe Application for Cert of Authority, #3 Exhibit C Foster and Monroe Certification of Authority, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E Federal Emergency Executive Order, #6 Exhibit F Georgia Emergency Order, #7 Exhibit G Georgia Emergency Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Crowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster and Monroe (LLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Does #3, #4, #5, #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Recovery Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami Len Crowell
Represented By: David Franklin Addleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?