Patton v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rodney Patton
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Not Classified By Court: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00174
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Patrick, Bradford)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney David B. Goetz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 08/25/2020. (JH)
August 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2907162, Fee Amount $20. (wwp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2907162, Fee Amount $200. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/2/2020. (wwp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2907162, Fee Amount $200, by Rodney Patton. Responses due by 9/2/2020. (Claxton, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Case practiced in, #2 Certificate of Good standing) (wwp).
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (pts)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #4 Amended Complaint - Attachment 3. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/28/2020. (pts)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Rodney Patton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Claxton, Edward)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (JH)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing deficiency re #1 Complaint. (JH)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Rodney Patton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JH)
August 4, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SAV038355. (JH)
August 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/18/2020. (JH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Patton
Represented By: David B. Goetz
Represented By: Edward B. Claxton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?