Jones v. Hooks
Petitioner: Israel Moses Jones
Respondent: Warden Brad Hooks
Not Classified By Court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00191
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Brad Hooks (Smith, Paula)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Brad Hooks (Malcolm, Clint)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brad Hooks answer/response due 10/20/2020. (loh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Respondent is ORDERED, within 60 days of this Order's entry on the docket, to file a response and to show cause why the relief sought should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/20/2020. (loh) Modified on 8/21/2020 (jlh).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Israel Moses Jones. (loh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Israel Moses Jones. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Israel Moses Jones.(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Brad Hooks
Represented By: Paula K. Smith
Represented By: Clint Christopher Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Israel Moses Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?