State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company v. Lian et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Long Quoc Duong, Derek Saari, Zam Lian, John Doe 3, Lucia Altamirano, Christopher Jones, John Doe 2, Turo, Inc., Ivan Duong and John Doe 1
Case Number: 4:2020cv00205
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Derek Saari answer due 11/15/2020. (jlh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Derek Saari on 10/25/20, filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (White, Mason)
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Turo, Inc.. (Greiner, Garrett)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Turo, Inc..(Greiner, Garrett)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christopher Jones. (Anderson, Carl)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Christopher Jones.(Anderson, Carl)
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Derek Saari on (No Service), filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (White, Mason)
October 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Long Quoc Duong answer due 10/30/2020; Zam Lian answer due 10/30/2020. (loh)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting re #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File to October 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/8/2020. (loh)
October 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 30, 2020 . (JH)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 30, 2020 , by Long Quoc Duong, Zam Lian. Responses due by 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Windsor, Travis)
October 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Zam Lian answer due 10/20/2020. (wwp)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Zam Lian on 9/29/20, filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (White, Mason)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint (Lucia Altamirano) Acknowledgement filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (White, Mason)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Lucia Altamirano.(Osteen, Christopher)
September 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Christopher Jones answer due 10/11/2020. (MG)
September 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Long Quoc Duong answer due 10/11/2020. (ca)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christopher Jones on 9/20/20, filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (White, Mason)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Long Quoc Duong a/k/a Ivan Duong on 9/20/20, filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (White, Mason)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Lucia Altamirano, Long Quoc Duong, Christopher Jones, Zam Lian, Derek Saari, Turo, Inc. (JH)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (White, Mason)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (White, Mason)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (White, Mason)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (White, Mason)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (White, Mason)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (White, Mason)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (White, Mason)
August 28, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2913661. (loh)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 928/2020. (loh)
August 28, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company v. Lian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Quoc Duong
Represented By: Travis D. Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Saari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zam Lian
Represented By: Travis D. Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucia Altamirano
Represented By: Christopher Joel Osteen
Represented By: James N. Osteen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Jones
Represented By: Carl H. Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turo, Inc.
Represented By: Garrett R. Greiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Duong
Represented By: Travis D. Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Mason White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?