James v. Warden, FCC Coleman - USP I
Petitioner: Calvin B James
Respondent: Warden, FCC Coleman - USP I
Case Number: 4:2020cv00218
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/5/2020. (JH)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (JH)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Transferal of Action. (JH)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Case transfer in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00425. Case transferred electronically
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSFER to the District of Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division. ***Case closed. (LMF)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/14/2020. (CAW)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2020. (MD)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(HAI)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Calvin B. James. (No fees paid, no service copies provided) (HAI) (HAI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Warden, FCC Coleman - USP I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCC Coleman - USP I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Calvin B James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?