Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Curtis Cooper, Heritage Memorial Funding LLC and Donna Cooper
Case Number: 4:2020cv00237
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Curtis Cooper.(JH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Curtis Cooper served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Heritage Memorial Funding LLC waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/5/2020. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Donna Cooper waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/5/2020. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/1/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Curtis Cooper, Donna Cooper, Heritage Memorial Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Curtis Cooper, #2 Summons Donna Cooper)(wwp)
September 30, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2936091. (wwp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Curtis Cooper, Donna Cooper, Heritage Memorial Funding LLC, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - 05.19.20 Beneficiary Designation, #3 Exhibit C - 07.26.01 Beneficiary Designation, #4 Exhibit D - Death Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment, #6 Exhibit F - 06.23.20 Claim Form, #7 Exhibit G - Letters, #8 Exhibit H - 07.30.20 Letter, #9 Exhibit I - 08.13.20 Letter, #10 Exhibit J - 08.18.20 Letter, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Memorial Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron E. Pohlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?