Widner v. United States Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement (ICE)
Petitioner: Gabriel Widner
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement (ICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00270
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gabriel Widner. (loh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Gabriel Widner to collection of fees. (loh)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 11/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/12/2020. (JH)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Inmate Account Statement by Gabriel Widner. (loh)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gabriel Widner. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Compliance due by 11/20/2020. (jrb)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Claim that the Petitioner is a Derivative United States Citizen by Gabriel Widner. Responses due by 11/13/2020. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widner v. United States Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement (ICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement (ICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel Widner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?