Miller v. Ruffini et al
Plaintiff: Sundiadaa Qrundaa Miller
Defendant: Office of the District Attorney, Savannah Police Department, Abbassi Bijian and Timothy Ruffini
Case Number: 4:2020cv00292
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sundiadaa Qrundaa Miller. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting re #4 Motion to Amend/Correct re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/4/20. (loh)
December 3, 2020 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number SAV038843. (loh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend re #1 Complaint/NOTICE of Filing Amendment Attachment to page 3 as to #1 Complaint, by Sundiadaa Qrundaa Miller. (loh) Modified on 12/4/2020 (loh).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/20/20. (loh)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sundiadaa Qrundaa Miller. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sundiadaa Qrundaa Miller. (JH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020: #1 Envelope) (JH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Ruffini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundiadaa Qrundaa Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbassi Bijian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Ruffini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?