Johnson v. Benton et al
Plaintiff: William E. Johnson
Defendant: C. Worthen, Cifuentes, Stratton, Brooks L. Benton, Jackson, C. Betterson, P. Glenn and Love
Case Number: 4:2021cv00047
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit IFP Paperwork, by William E. Johnson. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William E. Johnson. (loh)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT by Prisoner William E. Johnson to collection of fees. (loh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by William E. Johnson. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William E. Johnson. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 3/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/12/21. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms) (JH)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Brooks L. Benton, C. Betterson, C. Worthen, Love, Stratton, Jackson, Cifuentes. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 2/26/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/12/21. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (wwp)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by William E. Johnson. (wwp)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (wwp) Modified on 2/12/2021 (wwp).
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William E. Johnson.(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Benton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Worthen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cifuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks L. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Betterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?