Deason v. The Kroger Co. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Deason
Defendant: John Does NOS 1-10 and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00064
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by The Kroger Co.. (O'Hearn, Beverly)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2021. Discovery due by 9/8/2021. Motions due by 10/8/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/10/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 8/9/2021. Status Report due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 03/24/2021. (maa)
March 24, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jrb)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Hearn, Beverly)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Motions Pending . (O'Hearn, Beverly)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing that a #1 Notice of Removal, has been docketed in the Southern District of Georgia. Set/Reset Deadlines: State Court Motions due by 3/19/2021. (wwp) Modified on 3/9/2021 (wwp).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co. from State Court of Effingham County, case number STCV2020000341. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC - 3055556), filed by The Kroger Co. Exhibit A - Discovery, Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Discovery, Exhibit C - Complaint, State Summons, State Answer by Kroger, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deason v. The Kroger Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Deason
Represented By: Dustin W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does NOS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Beverly G. O'Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?