O'Sullivan v. The Kroger Co. et al
Plaintiff: Tara O'Sullivan
Defendant: Grayhawk Leasing, LLC, The Kroger Co. and ABC Corporation 1-3
Case Number: 4:2021cv00072
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/27/2021. (MD)
April 21, 2021 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 4/27/2021 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Parties will be contacted by email with dial-in instructions.(MD)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Hearing and #19 Motion for Hearing. A Telephonic Discovery Conference will be held on 4/27/2021 at 3:00 p.m. Parties will be contacted by email with dial-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/21/2021. (MD) Modified on 4/21/2021 to correct hearing date (MD).
April 21, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Hearing Notice of request for discovery dispute conference by The Kroger Co.. Responses due by 5/5/2021. (O'Hearn, Beverly)
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #16 Notice of Request for an Informal Discovery Dispute Conference. (thb)
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Hearing. (thb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for a Hearing by The Kroger Co. Notice of Request for an Informal Discovery Dispute Conference. (O'Hearn, Beverly) Modified on 4/21/2021 (thb).
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #14 Notice of Filing. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/4/2021. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal.(thb Modified on 4/20/2021 (thb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Filing by The Kroger Co. re #5 Statement of Motions Pending Kroger's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (O'Hearn, Beverly) Modified on 4/20/2021 (thb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE that discovery is not filed with the Court re #12 Initial Disclosures F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1). (thb)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***Initial Disclosures F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1) by The Kroger Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MOI Kroger)(O'Hearn, Beverly) Modified on 4/19/2021 (thb).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2021. Discovery due by 10/22/2021. Motions due by 11/23/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 8/23/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 9/22/2021. Status Report due by 11/8/2021. All motions, other than summary judgment motions and motions to dismiss, shall be accompanied with a proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/6/2021. (ca)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Hearn, Beverly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2021: #1 corrected pdf) (cmr).
April 5, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (cmr)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Grayhawk Leasing, LLC. (Pool, Scot)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint -Cross-claim of the Kroger Co. by Grayhawk Leasing, LLC.(Pool, Scot) Modified on 3/31/2021 linkage added(cmr).
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Kroger Co.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Hearn, Beverly)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Defendant Kroger to file an amended #1 Notice of Removal, within fourteen days from the date of this order listing all members of Defendant Grayhawk Leasing and their citizenships. (Compliance due by 4/5/2021.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 03/22/2021. (jlh)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 Statement of Motions Pending . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)(O'Hearn, Beverly)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to all counsel of record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: State Motions due by 3/22/2021. (wwp)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/15/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co. from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV20-01407. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC - 3060143), filed by The Kroger Co. Exhibit A: State Complaint, State Answers, State Amended Complaint, State Discovery, Exhibit B: State Affidavit, State Answer, Exhibit B: State Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Sullivan v. The Kroger Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara O'Sullivan
Represented By: Andrew Zemany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grayhawk Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Scot V. Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Beverly G. O'Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?