Vida Y Estilo Corp. et al v. EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vida Y Estilo Corp. and TM V&E LLC
Defendant: EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc., Moises Vera, Moises Vera, Jr., OH and Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco
Case Number: 4:2021cv00084
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulation of Dismissal and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/27/21. (wwp)
May 25, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by TM V&E LLC, Vida Y Estilo Corp.. (Messer, David)
May 6, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties by EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc., Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco, Moises Vera, Moises Vera, Jr re #16 Answer to Complaint (DeMott, Matthew)
May 6, 2021 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc., Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco, Moises Vera, Moises Vera, Jr.(DeMott, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint by May 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 04/29/2021. (maa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by and including May 6, 2021 by EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc., Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco, Moises Vera, Moises Vera, Jr. Responses due by 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeMott, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Drew DeMott on behalf of All Defendants (DeMott, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on El Oh Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc. on 04/08/2021, filed by TM V&E LLC, Vida Y Estilo Corp.. (Messer, David)
April 28, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by and including May 6, 2021 (pts)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco on 04/08/2021, filed by TM V&E LLC, Vida Y Estilo Corp.. (Messer, David)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Moises Vera, Jr. on 04/08/2021, filed by TM V&E LLC, Vida Y Estilo Corp.. (Messer, David)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Moises Vera on 04/08/2021, filed by TM V&E LLC, Vida Y Estilo Corp.. (Messer, David)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Christian Jay Sanchelima. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/9/21. (wwp)
April 8, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petitioner Christian J. Sanchelima Receipt Number AGASDC-3079091, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petitioner Christian J. Sanchelima Receipt Number AGASDC-3079091, Fee Amount $200, by TM V&E LLC, Vida Y Estilo Corp.. Responses due by 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Admission, #2 LR 83.4 (iii) Attachment, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Messer, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing an action regarding a Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (wwp)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/31/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by TM V&E LLC, Vida Y Estilo Corp. (wwp)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc., Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco, Moises Vera, Moises Vera, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(wwp)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc., Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco, Moises Vera, Moises Vera, Jr filed by Vida Y Estilo Corp., TM V&E LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)
March 30, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC - 3073008. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vida Y Estilo Corp. et al v. EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL OH Mexico! Bar & Grill Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Drew DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moises Vera
Represented By: Matthew Drew DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moises Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Drew DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OH
Represented By: Matthew Drew DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liliana P. Vazquez Pacheco
Represented By: Matthew Drew DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Y Estilo Corp.
Represented By: David M. Messer
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TM V&E LLC
Represented By: David M. Messer
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?