Nails v. Savannah Plastic Surgery et al
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Defendant: Savannah Plastic Surgery and Scott W. Vann
Case Number: 4:2021cv00153
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 19 USCA Case Number 21-12263-G for #17 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Nails. (jlh)
July 9, 2021 F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re #17 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (jlh)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #17 Notice of Appeal, #15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, and #16 Judgment. Other Appeals: No; Judge Appealed: Judge R. Stan Baker; Court Reporter: N/A; Fee Paid: No; Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Record on Appeal.) (jlh)
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and #16 Judgment, by Angela Nails. (jlh)
June 25, 2021 Filing 16 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to #15 . Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/25/2021. (ca)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #11 of the Magistrate Judge as its opinion. The case is dismissed without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/24/2021. (ca)
June 9, 2021 Filing 14 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Angela Nails re #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (ca)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #9 Amended Complaint filed by Angela Nails by Angela Nails. Responses due by 6/22/2021. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Angela Nails. (jrb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the #9 Amended Complaint filed by Angela Nails be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/2/2021. (ca)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Nails. Responses due by 6/15/2021. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(slt)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Savannah Plastic Surgery, filed by Angela Nails.(slt)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for an informal discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/27/2021. (csr)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION (Notice of Request) for an Informal Discovery Dispute Conference, by Angela Nails. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to file a supplement to her motion to proceed in forma pauperis within 14 days. (Compliance due by 6/4/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/21/21. (wwp)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/17/2021. (pts)
May 17, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (pts)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 REMARK - Waiver of Service of Summons Submitted by Plaintiff. (pts)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Angela Nails. (pts)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Nails. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(pts)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angela Nails. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nails v. Savannah Plastic Surgery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah Plastic Surgery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott W. Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?