Intake Direct LLC v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Intake Direct LLC
Defendant: Anthony Johnson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00191
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 08/03/2021. (jlh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Intake Direct LLC (Perkins, Benjamin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Intake Direct LLC. (Perkins, Benjamin)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Answer/Response due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 07/08/2021. (thb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to August 2, 2021 (Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Anthony Johnson. Responses due by 7/22/2021. (Anulewicz, Christopher) Modified on 7/8/2021 (thb).
July 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthony Johnson answer due 8/2/2021. (thb)
July 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthony Johnson answer due 7/23/2021. (thb)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Defendant Anthony Johnson's Acknowledgment of Service Acknowledgement filed by Intake Direct LLC. (Perkins, Benjamin)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Intake Direct LLC re #1 Complaint Declaration of Cason Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perkins, Benjamin) Modified on 7/1/2021 (slt).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/30/2021. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2021: #1 Notice of Litigant's Bill of Rights) (ca).
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anthony Johnson. (csr)
June 30, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (csr)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Johnson, filed by Intake Direct LLC. $402.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-3136471. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intake Direct LLC v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S. Anulewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intake Direct LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Mason Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?