McElroy v. U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Todd McElroy
Defendant: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith, District Judge William T. Moore, Jr. and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 4:2021cv00196
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/10/21. (loh)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING the #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion, overruling Plaintiff's #7 - #8 objections, dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint, and closing this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 08/05/2021. (jlh) Modified on 8/5/2021 (jlh).
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Amended OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Todd McElroy. (jrb)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Todd McElroy. (jrb)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Submitted. (jrb)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this #1 Complaint be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/12/2021. (ca)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/12/2021. (ca)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 07/09/2021. (jlh)
July 9, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Todd McElroy. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh) Modified on 7/9/2021 (jlh).
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Todd McElroy.(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElroy v. U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Judge William T. Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?