Adair v. Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC
Plaintiff: Raunie Adair
Defendant: Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00199
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC. (Shultz, Chad)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC identifying EYM Pizza, LP as Corporate Parent.. (Shultz, Chad)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC.(Shultz, Chad)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raunie Adair. Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Herman, Charles)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC. (slt)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Herman, Charles)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Raunie Adair. (Herman, Charles)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Raunie Adair. (Herman, Charles)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Litigant's Bill of Rights) (ca)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC, filed by Raunie Adair. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
July 9, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3142355. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adair v. Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raunie Adair
Represented By: Charles Seaton Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eym Pizza of Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Chad A. Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?