Green v. Atlas Senior Living, LLC
Plaintiff: Bernita Green
Defendant: Atlas Senior Living, LLC and Shepherd Senior Living, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00237
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Dustin Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/1/21. (wwp)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John L. Mays. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/1/21. (loh)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Arnold W. Umbach, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/1/21. (loh)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing by Bernita Green re #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Dustin L. Crawford) Receipt Number AGASDC-3198045, Fee Amount $200, (Coffman, Andrew)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by Bernita Green re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (John L. Mays) Receipt Number AGASDC-3198031, Fee Amount $200, (Coffman, Andrew)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Dustin L. Crawford) Receipt Number AGASDC-3198045, Fee Amount $200, by Bernita Green. Responses due by 10/14/2021. (Coffman, Andrew)
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (John L. Mays) Receipt Number AGASDC-3198031, Fee Amount $200, by Bernita Green. Responses due by 10/14/2021. (Coffman, Andrew)
September 30, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Dustin L. Crawford) Receipt Number AGASDC-3198045, Fee Amount $200,, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (John L. Mays) Receipt Number AGASDC-3198031, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arnold W. Umbach, III Receipt Number AGASDC-3196218, Fee Amount $200, by Atlas Senior Living, LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bradley, Lucas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Atlas Senior Living, LLC. (Bradley, Lucas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Atlas Senior Living, LLC. (Bradley, Lucas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Atlas Senior Living, LLC.(Bradley, Lucas)
September 28, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arnold W. Umbach, III Receipt Number AGASDC-3196218, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 09/15/2021. (thb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Answer or Otherwise Respond o Plaintiff's Complaint by Atlas Senior Living, LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Lucas)
September 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Atlas Senior Living, LLC answer due 9/29/2021. (thb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution, Case Management Procedures, Civil Cover Sheet and General Order served on Jane Richardson as Registered Agent on 08/25/2021, filed by Bernita Green. (Coffman, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Atlas Senior Living, LLC. (csr)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/23/2021. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2021: #1 Notice) (JH).
August 23, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (csr)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlas Senior Living, LLC, filed by Bernita Green. $402.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-3170398. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) Modified on 8/23/2021 (JH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Atlas Senior Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Senior Living, LLC
Represented By: Arnold W. Umbach, III
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shepherd Senior Living, LLC
Represented By: Arnold W. Umbach, III
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernita Green
Represented By: Andrew Y. Coffman
Represented By: Dustin L. Crawford
Represented By: John L. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?