Smith v. Gemcap Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Smith
Defendant: Gemcap Trucking, Inc., Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc., Humberto Jimenez and John Does
Case Number: 4:2021cv00243
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gemcap Trucking, Inc., Humberto Jimenez, Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.. (Kalfus, Shawn)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Ashenden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/22/21. (loh)
September 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kalfus, Shawn)
September 21, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number AGASDC-3187036, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3187036, Fee Amount $200, by Phyllis Smith. Responses due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Eugene) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2021: ***Entered in Error***) (gmh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2021: #4 Correct Attachments) (JH). Modified on 9/21/2021 (JH).
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene C. Brooks, IV on behalf of Phyllis Smith (Brooks, Eugene)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 08/26/2021. (jlh)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal to All Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/5/2021.) (jlh) Modified on 8/26/2021 (jlh).
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court of Bryan County, Georgia, case number STSV2021000149, filed by Humberto Jimenez, Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc., and Gemcap Trucking, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3173707.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request to Admit, and Request for Production to Defendant Gemcap Trucking, Inc., Affidavit of Service on Defendant Gemcap Trucking Inc., Affidavit of Service on Defendant Humberto Jimenez, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Prime Property and Casualty Insurance Inc., and Answer of Defendant Gemcap Trucking, Inc. and Humberto Jimenez, and Answer of Defendant Prime Property and Casualty Insurance Inc., and #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jlh).
August 26, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Gemcap Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Smith
Represented By: Eugene C. Brooks, IV
Represented By: Thomas J. Ashenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemcap Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto Jimenez
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?