Hanchard v. Wilcher et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Marlesha Hanchard
Defendant: John T. Wilcher, John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputy Supervisors and/or Correctional Supervisors (1-10) and John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputies and/or Correctional Officers (1-10)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00262
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting re #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rook Elizabeth Ringer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/28/21. (loh)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER dismissing as a duplicate #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/28/2021. (MD)
October 27, 2021 Filing 30 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff's Lead Counsel Rook Ringer (CORRECTED PER DEFICIENCY NOTICE) Receipt Number AGASDC-3216364, Fee Amount $200, by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. Responses due by 11/10/2021. (Jones, Craig)
October 27, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officerfor possible sanctions. Compliance due by 11/9/2021. (thb)
October 27, 2021 Filing 28 ***ENTERED IN ERROR**** (thb) Modified on 10/27/2021 (thb).
October 27, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff's Counsel Rook Ringer Receipt Number AGASDC-3215658, Fee Amount $200, #30 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff's Lead Counsel Rook Ringer, Receipt Number AGASDC-3216364, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff's Counsel Rook Ringer Receipt Number AGASDC-3215658, Fee Amount $200, by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. Responses due by 11/9/2021. (Jones, Craig)
September 27, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing by John T. Wilcher re #25 Answer to Complaint (Hart, Ralph)
September 27, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by John T. Wilcher.(Hart, Ralph)
September 23, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig T. Jones on behalf of Dawn Marlesha Hanchard (Jones, Craig)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Hart's signature on the instant motion is sufficient to constitute his appearance in this case, and is granted in part. Attorneys Mandel and Desrosiers do not comply with the attorney withdrawal provisions and is denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 09/22/2021. (jlh)
September 21, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE/Motion to Substitute Attorney by John T. Wilcher (Hart, Ralph) Modified on 9/21/2021 (thb).
September 21, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #22 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. (thb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Complaint was transferred into the Southern District of Georgia and assigned case number CV421-262 from the Middle District of Florida, case number CV621-688. (wwp)
September 16, 2021 Filing 20 Case transfer in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:21-cv-00688. Case transferred electronically
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the Savannah Division of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Once the transfer is complete, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/15/2021. (BIA)
September 3, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #11 Motion to Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. (Ringer, Rook)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due by 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/24/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Venue as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. (Ringer, Rook) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 8/24/2021 (SPM).
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2021. (LLM)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. R. Jonathan Hart is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/4/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for R. Jonathan Hart to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18543790 for $150 by John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputies and/or Correctional Officers (1-10), John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputy Supervisors and/or Correctional Supervisors (1-10), John T. Wilcher. (Mandel, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputies and/or Correctional Officers (1-10), John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputy Supervisors and/or Correctional Supervisors (1-10), John T. Wilcher. (Mandel, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/3/2021 (matched text to pleading) (KNC).
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Venue by John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputies and/or Correctional Officers (1-10), John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputy Supervisors and/or Correctional Supervisors (1-10), John T. Wilcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mandel, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/3/2021 (matched text to pleading) (KNC).
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 07/07/2021 by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard as to John T. Wilcher. (Ringer, Rook)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. (Ringer, Rook)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #6 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/10/21. (EJV)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. Related case(s): No (Ringer, Rook)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order pdf by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. (Ringer, Rook)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/21/2021. (BIA)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to John T. Wilcher. (KNC)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-0688-RBD-DCI. (SJB)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18151991) filed by Dawn Marlesha Hanchard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons (Wilcher))(Ringer, Rook) Modified on 4/20/2021 (deleted duplicate language) (KNC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanchard v. Wilcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Marlesha Hanchard
Represented By: Rook Elizabeth Ringer
Represented By: Craig T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Wilcher
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Mandel
Represented By: Alex G. Desrosiers
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputy Supervisors and/or Correctional Supervisors (1-10)
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Mandel
Represented By: Alex G. Desrosiers
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe Sheriff's Deputies and/or Correctional Officers (1-10)
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Mandel
Represented By: Alex G. Desrosiers
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?