Owners Insurance Company v. Dock et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Tamara Nicole Dock and Antoine Omar McLendon
Case Number: 4:2021cv00266
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Antoine Omar McLendon. Antoine Omar McLendon waiver sent on 11/17/2021, answer due 1/16/2022. (Moss, Carrie)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 Brief in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Tamara Nicole Dock and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Tamara Nicole Dock. (Savage, Brent)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Intent to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Response by Tamara Nicole Dock re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Savage, Brent)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Tamara Nicole Dock and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Beldt, Bret)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Tamara Nicole Dock and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tamara Nicole Dock. Responses due by 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Letter Limits Exhausted)(Savage, Brent)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Defendant Tamara Dock, as Surviving Parent of Albert Wilson Dock and as Administrator of the Estate of Albert Wilson Dock Acknowledgement filed by Tamara Nicole Dock. (Savage, Brent)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JH)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Beldt, Bret)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Beldt, Bret)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 09/22/2021. (jlh)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Submitted. (jlh)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tamara Nicole Dock and Antoine Omar McLendon, filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3191315, $402.00.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Dock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Bret A. Beldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Nicole Dock
Represented By: Brent Savage
Represented By: Kathryn Hughes Pinckney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Omar McLendon
Represented By: Carrie A. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?