Greene v. Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Joel Greene
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Georgia Department of Corrections, Dr. Olatunji Awe, Awemd, Inc., Dr. A. Wilson, P.A. Hall, John/Jane Does 1-10 and Consilium Staffing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00277
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave of Absence requested by Peter Fisher for the period of December 27-31, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/17/2021. (csr)
November 17, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia for dates of : December 27, 2021; December 28, 2021; December 29, 2021; December 30, 2021; December 31, 2021 by Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. Responses due by 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Peter)
November 17, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #30 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia for dates of : December 27, 2021; December 28, 2021; December 29, 2021; December 30, 2021; December 31, 2021. (JH)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting re #28 Motion for Leave of Absence for dates of December 27 - 31, 2021; January 10 - 12, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/16/21. (loh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Olatunji Awe, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Georgia Department of Corrections, P.A. Hall for dates of : December 27 - 31, 2021; January 10 - 12, 2022 by Olatunji Awe, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Georgia Department of Corrections, P.A. Hall. Responses due by 11/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kang, Jason)
November 16, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Olatunji Awe, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Georgia Department of Corrections, P.A. Hall for dates of : December 27 - 31, 2021; January 10 - 12, 2022. (JH)
November 9, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Awemd, Inc.(loh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Awemd, Inc. (slt)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2021. Discovery due by 5/13/2022. Motions due by 6/13/2022. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 3/1/2022. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/31/2022. Status Report due by 5/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/8/2021. (ca)
November 5, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant AWEMD, INC. By Clerk Pursuant to FRCP 55(a) by Joel Greene. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Smith, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Joyce, Carlton)
November 5, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH)
October 29, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal Defendant Arlene Wilson, M.D.'s Motion to Strike Paragraphs 44-46 and Exhibit 11 of Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint, #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal Defendant Consilium Staffing, LLC's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 44-46 and Exhibit 11 of Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint filed by Joel Greene. (Smith, William)
October 25, 2021 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Consilium Staffing, LLC. (Joyce, Carlton)
October 25, 2021 Filing 20 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Consilium Staffing, LLC. (Joyce, Carlton)
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 Defendant Consilium Staffing, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint As Amended by Consilium Staffing, LLC.(Joyce, Carlton)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal Defendant Consilium Staffing, LLC's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 44-46 and Exhibit 11 of Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint by Consilium Staffing, LLC. Responses due by 11/8/2021. (Joyce, Carlton)
October 25, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal Defendant Consilium Staffing, LLC's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 44-46 and Exhibit 11 of Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint. (thb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Joel Greene. (Smith, William)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #15 Litigants' Bill of Rights. (thb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 Litigants' Bill of Rights by A. Wilson. (Joyce, Carlton) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2021: #1 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb).
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by A. Wilson. (Joyce, Carlton)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant Arlene Wilson, M.D.'s ANSWER to Complaint As Amended by A. Wilson.(Joyce, Carlton)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal Defendant Arlene Wilson, M.D.'s Motion to Strike Paragraphs 44-46 and Exhibit 11 of Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint by A. Wilson. Responses due by 10/29/2021. (Joyce, Carlton)
October 15, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal Defendant Arlene Wilson, M.D.'s Motion to Strike Paragraphs 44-46 and Exhibit 11 of Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint. (thb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by P.A. Hall. (Kang, Jason)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Consilium Staffing, LLC on 10/04/2021, filed by Joel Greene. (Smith, William)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 10/04/2021 by Joel Greene as to Consilium Staffing, LLC. (Smith, William) Modified on 10/5/2021 (thb).
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Drayton Bradley on behalf of Consilium Staffing, LLC, A. Wilson (Bradley, Lucas)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Olatunji Awe. (Kang, Jason)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Motions Pending At Time Of Removal. (Kang, Jason)
October 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Consilium Staffing, LLC answer due by 10/25/2021. (thb)
October 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: A. Wilson answer due 10/15/2021 pursuant to pages 156 and 157 of the #1 Notice of Removal. (thb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Consilium Staffing, LLC. (thb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Smith, William)
September 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: A. Wilson answer due 10/5/2021. (thb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/8/2021. (pts)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant's Bill of Rights) (pts)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court of Chatham County, case number STCV21-01585. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3196080)(pts)
September 28, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Greene
Represented By: William J. Smith
Represented By: William Julian Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Represented By: Jason H. Kang
Represented By: Peter F. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jason H. Kang
Represented By: Peter F. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Olatunji Awe
Represented By: Jason H. Kang
Represented By: Peter F. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awemd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. A. Wilson
Represented By: Carlton Edward Joyce
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Hall
Represented By: Jason H. Kang
Represented By: Peter F. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consilium Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Carlton Edward Joyce
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?