Withrow v. Alstatt et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Adam Withrow
Defendant: Jessica Alstatt and Udon Carter
Case Number: 4:2021cv00293
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within fourteen days of the date this Order is served. PLRA due by 12/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/24/21. (loh)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Inmate Account Statement by Benjamin Adam Withrow. (jlh)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Benjamin A. Withrow. (jlh)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Adam Withrow. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (gmh)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benjamin Adam Withrow.(jrb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing fee deficiency re #1 Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/29/2021. (wwp)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessica Alstatt, Udon Carter, filed by Benjamin Adam Withrow.(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Withrow v. Alstatt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Adam Withrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Alstatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Udon Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?