Withrow v. Wilcher
Plaintiff: Benajmin Adam Withrow
Defendant: Sheriff John T. Wilcher
Case Number: 4:2021cv00294
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. District Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to the case. (jlh)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 Inmate Account Statement by Benajmin Adam Withrow. (jlh)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Benajmin Adam Withrow. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Benjamin A. Withrow. (jlh)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John T. Wilcher, filed by Benajmin Adam Withrow.(jrb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Benajmin Adam Withrow. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (csr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Benajmin Adam Withrow. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(gmh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Benjamin A. Withrow. (gmh)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Order re Magistrate Assignment. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement Regarding Assignment)(thb)
October 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 10/27/2021. (JH)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within fourteen days of the date this Order is served. PLRA due by 10/27/2021. Plaintiff is DIRECTED, within fourteen days from the date of this order, to file an amended complaint in this case accurately detailing all of the cases he has filed in federal court under penalty of perjury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/13/21. (loh) Modified on 10/18/2021 (JH).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to John T. Wilcher. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 10/22/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (pts)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benajmin Adam Withrow. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (pts)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John T. Wilcher, filed by Benajmin Adam Withrow. (pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Withrow v. Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benajmin Adam Withrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff John T. Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?